House | 04/16/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1542 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 833 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 832 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 832 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 832 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Huffman | Journal Page: 832 |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 832 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 832 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 832 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 561 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 125 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 125 | |
Senate | 01/25/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/25/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |