1 | 1 | | By: Huffman S.B. No. 262 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed January 25, 2013; January 29, 2013, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice; |
---|
4 | 4 | | March 20, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 4, |
---|
5 | 5 | | Nays 1; March 20, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the reporting of criminal disposition completeness |
---|
11 | 11 | | percentage data. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Article 60.10, Code of Criminal Procedure, is |
---|
14 | 14 | | amended by amending Subsections (b), (c), (d), and (e) and adding |
---|
15 | 15 | | Subsection (e-1) to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (b) This article applies only to a county that has an |
---|
17 | 17 | | average disposition completeness percentage, including |
---|
18 | 18 | | individualized determinations for both juvenile and adult |
---|
19 | 19 | | dispositions, of less than 90 percent, as reflected in the most |
---|
20 | 20 | | recent [first] report submitted by the Department of Public Safety |
---|
21 | 21 | | [submits] under Article 60.21(b)(2) [on or after January 1, 2009]. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (c) The commissioners court of a county described by |
---|
23 | 23 | | Subsection (b) shall establish a local data advisory board as |
---|
24 | 24 | | described by Article 60.09 not later than the 120th day after the |
---|
25 | 25 | | date this article becomes applicable to the county based on the |
---|
26 | 26 | | report under Article 60.21(b)(2) [not later than November 1, |
---|
27 | 27 | | 2009]. A local data advisory board established under this article |
---|
28 | 28 | | may include any person described by Article 60.09(b) and must |
---|
29 | 29 | | include: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (1) the sheriff of the county, or the sheriff's |
---|
31 | 31 | | designee; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (2) an attorney who represents the state in the |
---|
33 | 33 | | district courts of the county; |
---|
34 | 34 | | (3) an attorney who represents the state in the county |
---|
35 | 35 | | courts of the county; |
---|
36 | 36 | | (4) the clerk for the district courts of the county, or |
---|
37 | 37 | | the clerk's designee; |
---|
38 | 38 | | (5) the clerk for the county courts of the county, or |
---|
39 | 39 | | the clerk's designee; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (6) the police chief of the municipality with the |
---|
41 | 41 | | greatest population located in the county, or the chief's designee; |
---|
42 | 42 | | (7) a representative of the county's automated data |
---|
43 | 43 | | processing services, if the county performs those services; and |
---|
44 | 44 | | (8) a representative of an entity with whom the county |
---|
45 | 45 | | contracts for automated data processing services, if the county |
---|
46 | 46 | | contracts for those services. |
---|
47 | 47 | | (d) In addition to the duties described by Article 60.09(a), |
---|
48 | 48 | | a local data advisory board for a county that is subject to the |
---|
49 | 49 | | requirements of [established under] this article must prepare a |
---|
50 | 50 | | data reporting improvement plan. The data reporting improvement |
---|
51 | 51 | | plan must: |
---|
52 | 52 | | (1) describe the manner in which the county intends to |
---|
53 | 53 | | improve the county's disposition completeness percentage; |
---|
54 | 54 | | (2) ensure that the county takes the steps necessary |
---|
55 | 55 | | for the county's average disposition completeness percentage to be |
---|
56 | 56 | | equal to or greater than 90 percent not later than the first |
---|
57 | 57 | | anniversary of the date this article becomes applicable to that |
---|
58 | 58 | | county based on the [in the first] report [the Department of Public |
---|
59 | 59 | | Safety submits] under Article 60.21(b)(2) [on or after January 1, |
---|
60 | 60 | | 2013]; and |
---|
61 | 61 | | (3) include a comprehensive strategy by which the |
---|
62 | 62 | | county will permanently maintain the county's disposition |
---|
63 | 63 | | completeness percentage at or above 90 percent. |
---|
64 | 64 | | (e) Not later than June 1 of each year[, 2010], a local data |
---|
65 | 65 | | advisory board for a county that is subject to the requirements of |
---|
66 | 66 | | [established under] this article shall submit to the Department of |
---|
67 | 67 | | Public Safety the data reporting improvement plan prepared for the |
---|
68 | 68 | | county. On receipt of a data reporting improvement plan under this |
---|
69 | 69 | | article, the department shall post the plan on the Internet website |
---|
70 | 70 | | maintained by the department. |
---|
71 | 71 | | (e-1) A county is released from its duties under this |
---|
72 | 72 | | article on the date the Department of Public Safety submits a report |
---|
73 | 73 | | under Article 60.21(b)(2) stating that the county has attained an |
---|
74 | 74 | | average disposition completeness percentage that is equal to or |
---|
75 | 75 | | greater than 90 percent. However, the county again becomes subject |
---|
76 | 76 | | to the requirements of this article if its average disposition |
---|
77 | 77 | | completeness percentage declines to a level that is less than 90 |
---|
78 | 78 | | percent as reflected in the department's report. |
---|
79 | 79 | | SECTION 2. Article 60.14, Code of Criminal Procedure, is |
---|
80 | 80 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
81 | 81 | | Art. 60.14. AWARD [ALLOCATION] OF GRANT PROGRAM MONEY FOR |
---|
82 | 82 | | CRIMINAL JUSTICE PROGRAMS. (a) An agency of the state, before |
---|
83 | 83 | | making a grant award [allocating money] to a county from any federal |
---|
84 | 84 | | or state criminal justice grant program [for the enhancement of |
---|
85 | 85 | | criminal justice programs], shall require that county to certify, |
---|
86 | 86 | | before the distribution of any money from the program, that the |
---|
87 | 87 | | county's average disposition completeness percentage, including |
---|
88 | 88 | | individualized determinations for both juvenile and adult |
---|
89 | 89 | | dispositions, is equal to or greater than 90 percent as determined |
---|
90 | 90 | | by the Department of Public Safety. |
---|
91 | 91 | | (b) In this article, "disposition completeness percentage" |
---|
92 | 92 | | has the meaning assigned by Article 60.21(c) [county has taken or |
---|
93 | 93 | | will take, using all or part of the allocated funds, all action |
---|
94 | 94 | | necessary to provide the Texas Department of Criminal Justice and |
---|
95 | 95 | | the Department of Public Safety any criminal history records |
---|
96 | 96 | | maintained by the county in the manner specified for purposes of |
---|
97 | 97 | | those departments]. |
---|
98 | 98 | | SECTION 3. Subsection (b), Article 60.21, Code of Criminal |
---|
99 | 99 | | Procedure, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
100 | 100 | | (b) The Department of Public Safety shall: |
---|
101 | 101 | | (1) monitor the submission of arrest and disposition |
---|
102 | 102 | | information by local jurisdictions; |
---|
103 | 103 | | (2) annually submit to the Legislative Budget Board, |
---|
104 | 104 | | the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of |
---|
105 | 105 | | representatives, the state auditor, and the standing committees in |
---|
106 | 106 | | the senate and house of representatives that have primary |
---|
107 | 107 | | jurisdiction over criminal justice and the Department of Public |
---|
108 | 108 | | Safety a report regarding the level of reporting by local |
---|
109 | 109 | | jurisdictions; |
---|
110 | 110 | | (3) identify local jurisdictions that do not report |
---|
111 | 111 | | arrest or disposition information or that partially report |
---|
112 | 112 | | information; and |
---|
113 | 113 | | (4) for use in determining the status of outstanding |
---|
114 | 114 | | dispositions, publish monthly on the Department of Public Safety's |
---|
115 | 115 | | Internet website or on another electronic publication a report |
---|
116 | 116 | | listing each arrest by local jurisdiction for which there is no |
---|
117 | 117 | | corresponding final court disposition. |
---|
118 | 118 | | SECTION 4. Subsection (g), Article 60.10, Code of Criminal |
---|
119 | 119 | | Procedure, is repealed. |
---|
120 | 120 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
121 | 121 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
122 | 122 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
123 | 123 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
124 | 124 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
125 | 125 | | * * * * * |
---|