House
|
05/20/2013
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3690
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3690
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3090
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1653
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 125
|
Senate
|
01/29/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 125
|
Senate
|
01/25/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|