E | 05/18/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
E | 05/07/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2719 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1513 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1450 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2410 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Record vote | RV#544 | Journal Page: 2409 |
House | 05/04/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2409 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2409 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2309 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2309 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 72 | Journal Page: 2309 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2163 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1419 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1419 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1214 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 696 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 667 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 678 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 658 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 562 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 161 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 161 | |
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |