E
|
05/18/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
E
|
05/07/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2548
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1498
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1419
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#437
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2202
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2169
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1698
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 1200
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1200
|
House
|
03/19/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 840
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 543
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 497
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 497
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 497
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 497
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 497
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 497
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 497
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 397
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 162
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 162
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|