E | 05/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1810 | |
E | 05/02/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1408 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2274 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1408 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1345 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2093 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Record vote | RV#406 | Journal Page: 2093 |
House | 05/01/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2093 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2093 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2070 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2070 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2070 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 39 | Journal Page: 2070 |
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1832 | |
House | 04/19/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1419 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1419 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 960 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 564 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 564 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 564 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 564 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 564 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 564 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 564 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 486 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 163 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 163 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |