House
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1103
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 660
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 615
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Motion to suspend three day rule fails
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 588
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 204
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 204
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|