Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB380 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Schwertner S.B. No. 380
 (In the Senate - Filed February 5, 2013; February 13, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 13, 2013, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; March 13, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the recording of an informal settlement conference to
 resolve a complaint to the Texas Medical Board against a physician.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (i), Section 164.003, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (i)  On request by a physician under review, the board shall
 make a recording of the informal settlement conference proceeding.
 The recording is a part of the investigative file and may not be
 released to a third party unless authorized under this subtitle.  On
 request of the physician, the board shall release the recording to
 the physician. The board may charge the physician a fee to cover
 the cost of recording the proceeding.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *