E | 04/17/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 04/17/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1073 | |
E | 04/17/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 976 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1626 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 934 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 942 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 893 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1540 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Record vote | RV#211 | Journal Page: 1540 |
House | 04/12/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1540 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1540 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1527 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1527 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1527 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1019 | Journal Page: 1527 |
House | 04/08/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/05/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1457 | |
House | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 1201 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1201 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 749 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 519 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 469 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 294 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 206 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 206 | |
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |