Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB410 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Watson S.B. No. 410
 (In the Senate - Filed February 6, 2013; February 13, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business and Commerce;
 March 13, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8,
 Nays 0; March 13, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the management and operation of certain municipally
 owned electric utilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 552.122, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Notwithstanding any other law, including a municipal
 ordinance or provision of a municipal charter, a municipality with
 a population of less than 850,000 that is served by a municipally
 owned electric utility system with 400,000 or more customers may
 transfer management and control of the municipality's electric
 utility system to a board of trustees appointed by the
 municipality's governing body.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *