E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/28/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5434 | |
Senate | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3852 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/23/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 4553 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2938 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 2938 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 2938 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2936 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 2166 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3764 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Record vote | RV#966 | Journal Page: 3763 |
House | 05/20/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3763 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3763 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3621 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3621 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3242 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1558 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1558 | |
House | 04/12/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1542 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Zaffirini | Journal Page: 880 |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 880 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 208 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 208 | |
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |