1 | 1 | | By: Hancock S.B. No. 434 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed February 7, 2013; February 13, 2013, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 24, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, |
---|
5 | 5 | | Nays 2; April 24, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the procedural requirements for action by the Texas |
---|
11 | 11 | | Commission on Environmental Quality on applications for production |
---|
12 | 12 | | area authorizations. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Subsection (d), Section 27.0513, Water Code, is |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (d) Notwithstanding Sections 5.551, 5.556, 27.011, and |
---|
17 | 17 | | 27.018, an application for an authorization submitted after |
---|
18 | 18 | | September 1, 2007, is an uncontested matter not subject to a |
---|
19 | 19 | | contested case hearing or the hearing requirements of Chapter 2001, |
---|
20 | 20 | | Government Code[, unless the authorization seeks any of the |
---|
21 | 21 | | following: |
---|
22 | 22 | | [(1) an amendment to a restoration table value; |
---|
23 | 23 | | [(2) the initial establishment of monitoring wells for |
---|
24 | 24 | | any area covered by the authorization, including the location, |
---|
25 | 25 | | number, depth, spacing, and design of the monitoring wells, unless |
---|
26 | 26 | | the executive director uses the recommendation of an independent |
---|
27 | 27 | | third-party expert chosen by the commission; or |
---|
28 | 28 | | [(3) an amendment to the type or amount of bond |
---|
29 | 29 | | required for groundwater restoration or by Section 27.073 to assure |
---|
30 | 30 | | that there are sufficient funds available to the state for |
---|
31 | 31 | | groundwater restoration or the plugging of abandoned wells in the |
---|
32 | 32 | | area by a third-party contractor]. |
---|
33 | 33 | | SECTION 2. Subsections (e) and (f), Section 27.0513, Water |
---|
34 | 34 | | Code, are repealed. |
---|
35 | 35 | | SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
36 | 36 | | to an application for an authorization that is submitted to the |
---|
37 | 37 | | Texas Commission on Environmental Quality on or after the effective |
---|
38 | 38 | | date of this Act. An application for an authorization that was |
---|
39 | 39 | | submitted to the commission before the effective date of this Act is |
---|
40 | 40 | | governed by the law in effect at the time the application was |
---|
41 | 41 | | submitted, and the former law is continued in effect for that |
---|
42 | 42 | | purpose. |
---|
43 | 43 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
44 | 44 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
45 | 45 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
46 | 46 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
47 | 47 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
48 | 48 | | * * * * * |
---|