Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB434 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hancock S.B. No. 434
 (In the Senate - Filed February 7, 2013; February 13, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources;
 April 24, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 2; April 24, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the procedural requirements for action by the Texas
 Commission on Environmental Quality on applications for production
 area authorizations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (d), Section 27.0513, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  Notwithstanding Sections 5.551, 5.556, 27.011, and
 27.018, an application for an authorization submitted after
 September 1, 2007, is an uncontested matter not subject to a
 contested case hearing or the hearing requirements of Chapter 2001,
 Government Code[, unless the authorization seeks any of the
 following:
 [(1)  an amendment to a restoration table value;
 [(2)     the initial establishment of monitoring wells for
 any area covered by the authorization, including the location,
 number, depth, spacing, and design of the monitoring wells, unless
 the executive director uses the recommendation of an independent
 third-party expert chosen by the commission; or
 [(3)     an amendment to the type or amount of bond
 required for groundwater restoration or by Section 27.073 to assure
 that there are sufficient funds available to the state for
 groundwater restoration or the plugging of abandoned wells in the
 area by a third-party contractor].
 SECTION 2.  Subsections (e) and (f), Section 27.0513, Water
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an application for an authorization that is submitted to the
 Texas Commission on Environmental Quality on or after the effective
 date of this Act.  An application for an authorization that was
 submitted to the commission before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect at the time the application was
 submitted, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *