House
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1493
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1422
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 621
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 609
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 210
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 210
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|