House | 05/07/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1189 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 641 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 641 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 641 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 640 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 640 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 640 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 640 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Fraser | Journal Page: 639 |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 639 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 384 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 210 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 210 | |
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |