House | 05/14/2013 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 2839 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2839 | |
House | 04/19/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1697 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1003 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 1002 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA2 Watson | Journal Page: 1002 |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1001 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1001 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 882 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 779 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 696 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 212 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 212 | |
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |