1 | 1 | | By: Hegar S.B. No. 467 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2013; February 13, 2013, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources; |
---|
4 | 4 | | April 3, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 9, |
---|
5 | 5 | | Nays 0; April 3, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the regulatory analysis of rules proposed by the Texas |
---|
11 | 11 | | Commission on Environmental Quality. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter D, Chapter 5, Water Code, is amended |
---|
14 | 14 | | by adding Section 5.1032 to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 5.1032. ADOPTION OF ENVIRONMENTAL RULES. (a) In this |
---|
16 | 16 | | section: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (1) "Cost" means a reasonably identifiable and |
---|
18 | 18 | | significant direct or indirect economic effect. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (2) "Environmental effect" means a reasonably |
---|
20 | 20 | | identifiable and quantifiable effect or outcome affecting the |
---|
21 | 21 | | environment, including air, soil, or water quality. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (3) "Environmental rule" means a rule the specific |
---|
23 | 23 | | intent of which is to protect the environment or reduce risks to |
---|
24 | 24 | | human health from environmental exposure. |
---|
25 | 25 | | (4) "Small business" means a business that employs not |
---|
26 | 26 | | more than 250 individuals. |
---|
27 | 27 | | (b) Before adopting an environmental rule, the commission |
---|
28 | 28 | | shall conduct a regulatory analysis that weighs the costs and |
---|
29 | 29 | | environmental effects expected to result from implementation of and |
---|
30 | 30 | | compliance with the rule. |
---|
31 | 31 | | (c) When giving notice of an environmental rule, the |
---|
32 | 32 | | commission shall incorporate into the fiscal note required by |
---|
33 | 33 | | Section 2001.024, Government Code, a draft impact analysis |
---|
34 | 34 | | describing the anticipated effects of the proposed rule. The draft |
---|
35 | 35 | | impact analysis, at a minimum, must: |
---|
36 | 36 | | (1) identify the problem the rule is intended to |
---|
37 | 37 | | address; |
---|
38 | 38 | | (2) identify the environmental effects that the agency |
---|
39 | 39 | | expects to result from implementation of and compliance with the |
---|
40 | 40 | | rule, including the projected level of reduction of pollutants or |
---|
41 | 41 | | contaminants in air, water, and soil media; |
---|
42 | 42 | | (3) identify and describe the costs that the agency |
---|
43 | 43 | | expects that state agencies, local governments, the public, and the |
---|
44 | 44 | | affected regulated entities, other than small businesses, will |
---|
45 | 45 | | incur from implementation of and compliance with the rule; and |
---|
46 | 46 | | (4) identify and describe in a separate economic |
---|
47 | 47 | | impact analysis the costs that the agency expects that small |
---|
48 | 48 | | businesses will incur from implementation of and compliance with |
---|
49 | 49 | | the rule. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (d) In identifying the environmental effects of a rule under |
---|
51 | 51 | | Subsection (c)(2), the commission shall include the modeled |
---|
52 | 52 | | improvement for the criteria pollutant design value expected from |
---|
53 | 53 | | implementation of the rule, if the rule will be included in this |
---|
54 | 54 | | state's air quality state implementation plan. |
---|
55 | 55 | | (e) After considering public comments submitted under |
---|
56 | 56 | | Section 2001.029, Government Code, and determining that a proposed |
---|
57 | 57 | | rule should be adopted, the agency shall prepare a final regulatory |
---|
58 | 58 | | analysis that complies with Section 2001.033, Government Code. |
---|
59 | 59 | | (f) A person who submitted a comment in accordance with |
---|
60 | 60 | | Section 2001.029, Government Code, may challenge the validity of an |
---|
61 | 61 | | environmental rule that is not proposed and adopted in strict |
---|
62 | 62 | | compliance with the procedural requirements of this section by |
---|
63 | 63 | | filing an action for declaratory judgment as provided by Section |
---|
64 | 64 | | 2001.038, Government Code, not later than the 30th day after the |
---|
65 | 65 | | effective date of the rule. If the court determines that an |
---|
66 | 66 | | environmental rule was not proposed and adopted in strict |
---|
67 | 67 | | compliance with the procedural requirements of this section, the |
---|
68 | 68 | | rule is invalid provided that a rule to be included in this state's |
---|
69 | 69 | | air quality state implementation plan may not be invalidated for |
---|
70 | 70 | | failure of strict compliance if the invalidation will prevent the |
---|
71 | 71 | | timely implementation of a federal requirement. |
---|
72 | 72 | | SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only |
---|
73 | 73 | | to a rule proposed by the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality |
---|
74 | 74 | | for which notice is given under Sections 2001.023 and 2001.024, |
---|
75 | 75 | | Government Code, on or after December 1, 2013. |
---|
76 | 76 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
77 | 77 | | * * * * * |
---|