Senate | 04/24/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 799 | |
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 214 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 214 | |
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |