Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB481 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 481
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2013; February 13, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice;
 April 10, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 2; April 10, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the recognition and validity of a license to carry a
 concealed handgun issued by another state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 411.173, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (b-1) to read as follows:
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), a person's license to
 carry a concealed handgun issued by another state may not be
 recognized and is not valid in this state if the person has
 established a domicile in this state. For purposes of this
 subsection, "domicile" has the meaning assigned by Section 522.003,
 Transportation Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *