House | 05/15/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 05/08/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2072 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2072 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1677 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 999 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 998 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 998 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 998 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 940 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 215 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 215 | |
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |