Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB496 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Seliger, Eltife S.B. No. 496
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2013; February 13, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 15, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 1; April 15, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 496 By:  Seliger


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the Texas Higher Education
 Coordinating Board to review and approve capital projects and
 purchases of real property at public institutions of higher
 education in this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsections (b), (d), and (e), Section 61.0572,
 Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The board shall:
 (1)  determine formulas for space utilization in all
 educational and general buildings and facilities at institutions of
 higher education;
 (2)  devise and promulgate methods to assure maximum
 daily and year-round use of educational and general buildings and
 facilities, including but not limited to maximum scheduling of day
 and night classes and maximum summer school enrollment;
 (3)  consider plans for selective standards of
 admission when institutions of higher education approach capacity
 enrollment;
 (4)  require, and assist the public technical
 institutes, public senior colleges and universities, medical and
 dental units, and other agencies of higher education in developing
 long-range campus master plans for campus development; and
 (5)  [endorse, or delay until the next succeeding
 session of the legislature has the opportunity to approve or
 disapprove, the proposed purchase of any real property by an
 institution of higher education, except a public junior college;
 [(6)     develop and publish standards, rules, and
 regulations to guide the institutions and agencies of higher
 education in making application for the approval of new
 construction and major repair and rehabilitation of all buildings
 and facilities regardless of proposed use; and
 [(7)]  ascertain that the board's standards and
 specifications for new construction, repair, and rehabilitation of
 all buildings and facilities are in accordance with Chapter 469,
 Government Code [Article 9102, Revised Statutes].
 (d) [(1)]  The board[, for purposes of state funding,] may
 review purchases of [and approve as an addition to an institution's
 educational and general buildings and facilities inventory any]
 improved real property added to an institution's educational and
 general buildings and facilities inventory [acquired by gifts or
 lease-purchase only if:
 [(A)     the institution requests to place the
 improved real property on its educational and general buildings and
 facilities inventory; and
 [(B)     the value of the improved real property is
 more than $300,000 at the time the institution requests the
 property to be added to the educational and general buildings and
 facilities inventory.
 [(2)     This subsection does not apply to gifts, grants,
 or lease-purchase arrangements intended for clinical or research
 facilities.
 [(e)     Approval of the board is not required to acquire real
 property that is financed by bonds issued under Section 55.17(e)(3)
 or (4), 55.1713-55.1718, 55.1721-55.1728, 55.1735(a)(1), 55.174,
 55.1742, 55.1743, 55.1744, 55.1751-55.17592, 55.1768, 55.1771, or
 55.17721, except that the board shall review all real property to be
 financed by bonds issued under those sections] to determine whether
 the property meets the standards adopted by the board for cost,
 efficiency, and space use, but the purchase of the improved real
 property is not contingent on board review.  If the property does
 not meet those standards, the board shall notify the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and the Legislative Budget Board.  This subsection does not impair
 the board's authority to collect data relating to the improved real
 property that is added each year to the educational and general
 buildings and facilities inventory of institutions of higher
 education.
 SECTION 2.  Subsections (a) and (b), Section 61.058,
 Education Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  This section does not apply to [Except as provided by
 Subsection (b) of this section, the board shall approve or
 disapprove all new construction and repair and rehabilitation of
 all buildings and facilities at institutions of higher education
 financed from any source provided that:
 [(A)     the board's consideration and determination
 shall be limited to the purpose for which the new or remodeled
 buildings are to be used to assure conformity with approved space
 utilization standards and the institution's approved programs and
 role and mission if the cost of the project is not more than
 $4,000,000, but the board may consider cost factors and the
 financial implications of the project to the state if the total cost
 is in excess of $4,000,000;
 [(B)     the requirement of approval for new
 construction applies only to projects the total cost of which is in
 excess of $4,000,000;
 [(C)     the requirement of approval for major repair
 and rehabilitation of buildings and facilities applies only to a
 project the total cost of which is more than $4,000,000;
 [(D)     the requirement of approval or disapproval
 by the board does not apply to any new construction or major repair
 and rehabilitation project that is specifically approved by the
 legislature;
 [(E)     the requirement of approval by the board
 does not apply to a junior college's construction, repair, or
 rehabilitation financed entirely with funds from a source other
 than the state, including funds from ad valorem tax receipts of the
 college, gifts, grants, and donations to the college, and student
 fees; and
 [(F)     the requirement of approval by the board
 does not apply to construction, repair, or rehabilitation of
 privately owned buildings and facilities located on land leased
 from an institution of higher education if the construction,
 repair, or rehabilitation is financed entirely from funds not under
 the control of the institution, and provided further that:
 [(i)  the] buildings and facilities that are
 to be used exclusively for auxiliary enterprises[;] and
 [(ii)  the buildings and facilities] will
 not require appropriations from the legislature for operation,
 maintenance, or repair [unless approval by the board has been
 obtained].
 (b)  The [This section does not apply to construction,
 repair, or rehabilitation financed by bonds issued under Section
 55.17(e)(3) or (4), 55.1713-55.1718, 55.1721-55.1728, 55.174,
 55.1742, 55.1743, 55.1744, 55.1751-55.17592, 55.1768, 55.1771, or
 55.17721, except that the] board may [shall] review all
 construction, repair, or rehabilitation of buildings and
 facilities at institutions of higher education [to be financed by
 bonds issued under those sections] to determine whether the
 construction, rehabilitation, or repair meets the standards
 adopted by board rule for cost, efficiency, and space use, but the
 construction, rehabilitation, or repair is not contingent on board
 review.  If the construction, rehabilitation, or repair does not
 meet those standards, the board shall notify the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house of representatives,
 and the Legislative Budget Board.  This subsection does not impair
 the board's authority to collect data relating to the construction,
 repair, or rehabilitation of buildings and facilities occurring
 each year at institutions of higher education.
 SECTION 3.  The following provisions of the Education Code
 are repealed:
 (1)  Section 61.0573; and
 (2)  Subsection (c), Section 61.058.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *