E | 06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/27/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5381 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3778 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3737 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2916 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | RV#1057 | Journal Page: 4165 |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 4165 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4165 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4097 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4097 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/20/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3910 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/02/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1201 | |
House | 04/02/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1201 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 961 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 397 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 291 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 215 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 215 | |
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |