E | 05/10/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/10/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1765 | |
E | 05/01/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1371 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2157 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1329 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1371 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1271 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | RV#307 | Journal Page: 1863 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1863 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1863 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1821 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1821 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2087 | Journal Page: 1821 |
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/19/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1420 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1420 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 961 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 565 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 486 | |
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 215 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 215 | |
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |