House | 05/21/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3242 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1558 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1558 | |
House | 04/09/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1471 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 780 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 747 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 747 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 747 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 747 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 747 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 747 | |
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 746 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 255 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 255 | |
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |