E | 05/02/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/02/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1434 | |
E | 04/24/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1203 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 1826 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1178 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1172 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1089 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Record vote | RV#233 | Journal Page: 1664 |
House | 04/18/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1664 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1664 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1640 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1640 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1211 | Journal Page: 1640 |
House | 04/18/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1698 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1185 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 653 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 653 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 653 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 653 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 653 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 653 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 653 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 259 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 259 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |