E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3053
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2263
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#937
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3681
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3681
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1832
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/09/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1471
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 780
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 742
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 742
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 742
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 741
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 741
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 741
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 741
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 729
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Recommitted to committee
|
Health & Human Services
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Motion to recommit to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 659
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 259
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 259
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|