Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB550 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Uresti S.B. No. 550
 (In the Senate - Filed February 13, 2013; February 20, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 17, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 4; April 17, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 550 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the determination that a voter is deceased.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 18.068, Election Code, as added by
 Chapter 683 (H.B. 174), Acts of the 82nd Legislature, Regular
 Session, 2011, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 18.068.  COMPARISON OF INFORMATION REGARDING
 INELIGIBILITY. (a)  The secretary of state shall quarterly compare
 the information received under Section 16.001 of this code and
 Section 62.113, Government Code, to the statewide computerized
 voter registration list.  If the secretary determines that a voter
 on the registration list is deceased or has been excused or
 disqualified from jury service because the voter is not a citizen,
 the secretary shall send notice of the determination to the voter
 registrar of the counties considered appropriate by the secretary.
 (b)  In making the determination that a voter who has voted
 within the last four years is deceased under this section, the
 secretary of state must identify the following information as
 common to the voter and the deceased person:
 (1)  the last name;
 (2)  the date of birth; and
 (3)  the social security number.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *