House
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3909
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3186
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2363
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1414
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1258
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 260
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 260
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|