House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 713 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 712 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 658 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 260 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 260 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |