E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/16/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1908
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3362
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1863
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1908
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3209
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#815
|
Journal Page: 3210
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3210
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3210
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to Investments & Financial Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1558
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1558
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1102
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 623
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 590
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 590
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 590
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 590
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 590
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Carona
|
Journal Page: 590
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 590
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 590
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 262
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 262
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|