House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1186 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 654 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 654 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 654 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 654 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 654 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 654 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 654 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 263 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 263 | |
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |