Senate | 05/17/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/17/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 2035 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 279 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 279 | |
Senate | 02/18/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |