Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB612 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio S.B. No. 612
 (In the Senate - Filed February 18, 2013; February 25, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 May 17, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 1, 1 present not
 voting; May 17, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 612 By:  Lucio


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a drug testing requirement for a person elected to
 public elective office.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 141, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 141.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 141.005.  DRUG SCREENING AND TESTING REQUIREMENT FOR
 PERSONS ELECTED TO PUBLIC OFFICE. (a)  At the time a person is
 elected to a public elective office, the person must submit to a
 controlled substance use screening assessment.  A person whose
 controlled substance use screening assessment conducted under this
 section indicates good cause to suspect the person of controlled
 substance use shall submit to a drug test.
 (b)  The authority responsible for determining eligibility
 for the office to which the person is elected shall administer a
 screening assessment or drug test required under this section at
 the person's expense.
 (c)  After completion of a screening assessment or drug test
 required under this section, the authority that administered the
 assessment or drug test shall:
 (1)  obtain a waiver of confidentiality from the person
 with respect to the results of the screening assessment or drug
 test; and
 (2)  submit the results of the screening assessment or
 drug test to the Texas Ethics Commission.
 (d)  The Texas Ethics Commission shall release the results of
 a screening assessment and drug test conducted under this section
 as soon as is practicable.
 (e)  The secretary of state shall adopt rules to administer
 this section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *