E | 05/18/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
E | 05/07/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2548 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1498 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1420 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#437 | Journal Page: 2206 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2206 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2206 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2185 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2185 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2586 | Journal Page: 2185 |
House | 04/22/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1735 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Special Purpose Districts | Journal Page: 1454 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1454 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 961 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 486 | |
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 283 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 283 | |
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |