E
|
05/24/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3396
|
E
|
05/13/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1765
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3190
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1695
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2764
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#669
|
Journal Page: 2764
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2764
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2764
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2744
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2744
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1282
|
Journal Page: 2744
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2844
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1653
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 978
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 284
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 284
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|