House | 05/21/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/19/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3910 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 1452 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1452 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 745 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 519 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 464 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 464 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 464 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 464 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 464 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 464 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 464 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 338 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 93 | |
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 93 | |
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |