1 | 1 | | By: West S.B. No. 681 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed February 20, 2013; February 25, 2013, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Education; |
---|
4 | 4 | | May 2, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
5 | 5 | | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 2, 2013, |
---|
6 | 6 | | sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 681 By: West |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to a pilot program for a three-year high school diploma |
---|
13 | 13 | | plan and cost-neutral expansion of full-day prekindergarten |
---|
14 | 14 | | programs. |
---|
15 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
16 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 28, Education Code, is |
---|
17 | 17 | | amended by adding Section 28.0255 to read as follows: |
---|
18 | 18 | | Sec. 28.0255. PILOT PROGRAM: THREE-YEAR HIGH SCHOOL |
---|
19 | 19 | | DIPLOMA PLAN. (a) In this section, "certificate program," "public |
---|
20 | 20 | | junior college," "public state college," and "public technical |
---|
21 | 21 | | institute" have the meanings assigned by Section 61.003. |
---|
22 | 22 | | (b) This section applies only to a school district: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (1) with an enrollment of more than 150,000 students |
---|
24 | 24 | | that is located primarily in a county that: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (A) has a population of 2.2 million or more; and |
---|
26 | 26 | | (B) is adjacent to a county with a population of |
---|
27 | 27 | | more than 600,000; or |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) located in a county that borders the United |
---|
29 | 29 | | Mexican States and the Gulf of Mexico. |
---|
30 | 30 | | (c) A school district to which this section applies may |
---|
31 | 31 | | develop and implement a pilot program for students who wish to |
---|
32 | 32 | | obtain a high school diploma after completion of three years of |
---|
33 | 33 | | secondary school attendance as an alternative to the traditional |
---|
34 | 34 | | four-year period of attendance. The program must: |
---|
35 | 35 | | (1) be designed to serve the educational needs of |
---|
36 | 36 | | students who do not anticipate immediate enrollment in a four-year |
---|
37 | 37 | | college or university after graduation from high school; and |
---|
38 | 38 | | (2) include partnerships between the school district |
---|
39 | 39 | | and public junior colleges, public technical institutes, public |
---|
40 | 40 | | state colleges, and any other public postsecondary institutions in |
---|
41 | 41 | | this state offering academic or technical education or vocational |
---|
42 | 42 | | training under a certificate program or an associate degree program |
---|
43 | 43 | | to facilitate the prompt enrollment of students in those |
---|
44 | 44 | | institutions after high school graduation under the program. |
---|
45 | 45 | | (d) Participation by a student in the program must be |
---|
46 | 46 | | voluntary, with approval of the student's parent. A student who |
---|
47 | 47 | | agrees to participate in the program may, on request, discontinue |
---|
48 | 48 | | participation and resume taking courses under a high school program |
---|
49 | 49 | | based on a traditional four-year period of attendance. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (e) Notwithstanding Section 28.025, the school district |
---|
51 | 51 | | shall specify the curriculum requirements for receiving a high |
---|
52 | 52 | | school diploma under the program. The curriculum requirements must |
---|
53 | 53 | | ensure that a student who graduates under the program possesses |
---|
54 | 54 | | sufficient knowledge and skills in English language arts and |
---|
55 | 55 | | mathematics to be capable of performing successfully in public |
---|
56 | 56 | | junior college-level courses. |
---|
57 | 57 | | (f) The school district shall submit the proposed |
---|
58 | 58 | | curriculum requirements to the State Board of Education for comment |
---|
59 | 59 | | and the commissioner for approval. The district may not implement |
---|
60 | 60 | | the program before obtaining the commissioner's approval of the |
---|
61 | 61 | | proposed curriculum requirements. |
---|
62 | 62 | | (g) A student is entitled to a high school diploma if the |
---|
63 | 63 | | student: |
---|
64 | 64 | | (1) successfully complies with the curriculum |
---|
65 | 65 | | requirements specified under Subsection (e); and |
---|
66 | 66 | | (2) performs satisfactorily, as determined by the |
---|
67 | 67 | | commissioner under Subsection (h), on end-of-course assessment |
---|
68 | 68 | | instruments listed under Section 39.023(c) for courses in which the |
---|
69 | 69 | | student was enrolled. |
---|
70 | 70 | | (h) For purposes of Subsection (g)(2), the commissioner |
---|
71 | 71 | | shall determine the level of satisfactory performance on applicable |
---|
72 | 72 | | end-of-course assessment instruments administered to a student. |
---|
73 | 73 | | (i) The school district shall report the academic |
---|
74 | 74 | | achievement record of students who have completed the program on a |
---|
75 | 75 | | transcript that clearly identifies the program and distinguishes |
---|
76 | 76 | | the program from the other high school programs based on a |
---|
77 | 77 | | traditional four-year period of attendance. |
---|
78 | 78 | | (j) A student who has received a diploma under the program |
---|
79 | 79 | | is exempt from the compulsory school attendance requirements under |
---|
80 | 80 | | Section 25.085. |
---|
81 | 81 | | (k) To the extent this section conflicts with any other |
---|
82 | 82 | | provision of this code or rule adopted under this code, this section |
---|
83 | 83 | | prevails. |
---|
84 | 84 | | (l) This section expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
85 | 85 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter E, Chapter 42, Education Code, is |
---|
86 | 86 | | amended by adding Section 42.2526 to read as follows: |
---|
87 | 87 | | Sec. 42.2526. ADJUSTMENT FOR DISTRICT OPERATING PILOT |
---|
88 | 88 | | PROGRAM. (a) This section applies only to a school district |
---|
89 | 89 | | operating a pilot program authorized by Section 28.0255. |
---|
90 | 90 | | (b) Beginning with the first school year that follows the |
---|
91 | 91 | | first school year in which students receive high school diplomas |
---|
92 | 92 | | under the pilot program authorized by Section 28.0255 and |
---|
93 | 93 | | continuing for every subsequent school year that the district |
---|
94 | 94 | | operates the pilot program, the commissioner shall provide funding |
---|
95 | 95 | | for the district's prekindergarten program under Section 29.153 on |
---|
96 | 96 | | a full-day basis for a number of prekindergarten students equal to |
---|
97 | 97 | | twice the number of students who received a high school diploma |
---|
98 | 98 | | under the pilot program authorized by Section 28.0255 during the |
---|
99 | 99 | | preceding school year. |
---|
100 | 100 | | (c) This section expires September 1, 2023. |
---|
101 | 101 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
102 | 102 | | * * * * * |
---|