Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB681 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: West S.B. No. 681
 (In the Senate - Filed February 20, 2013; February 25, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 May 2, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 2, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 681 By:  West


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a pilot program for a three-year high school diploma
 plan and cost-neutral expansion of full-day prekindergarten
 programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.0255 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.0255.  PILOT PROGRAM: THREE-YEAR HIGH SCHOOL
 DIPLOMA PLAN. (a)  In this section, "certificate program," "public
 junior college," "public state college," and "public technical
 institute" have the meanings assigned by Section 61.003.
 (b)  This section applies only to a school district:
 (1)  with an enrollment of more than 150,000 students
 that is located primarily in a county that:
 (A)  has a population of 2.2 million or more; and
 (B)  is adjacent to a county with a population of
 more than 600,000; or
 (2)  located in a county that borders the United
 Mexican States and the Gulf of Mexico.
 (c)  A school district to which this section applies may
 develop and implement a pilot program for students who wish to
 obtain a high school diploma after completion of three years of
 secondary school attendance as an alternative to the traditional
 four-year period of attendance. The program must:
 (1)  be designed to serve the educational needs of
 students who do not anticipate immediate enrollment in a four-year
 college or university after graduation from high school; and
 (2)  include partnerships between the school district
 and public junior colleges, public technical institutes, public
 state colleges, and any other public postsecondary institutions in
 this state offering academic or technical education or vocational
 training under a certificate program or an associate degree program
 to facilitate the prompt enrollment of students in those
 institutions after high school graduation under the program.
 (d)  Participation by a student in the program must be
 voluntary, with approval of the student's parent. A student who
 agrees to participate in the program may, on request, discontinue
 participation and resume taking courses under a high school program
 based on a traditional four-year period of attendance.
 (e)  Notwithstanding Section 28.025, the school district
 shall specify the curriculum requirements for receiving a high
 school diploma under the program.  The curriculum requirements must
 ensure that a student who graduates under the program possesses
 sufficient knowledge and skills in English language arts and
 mathematics to be capable of performing successfully in public
 junior college-level courses.
 (f)  The school district shall submit the proposed
 curriculum requirements to the State Board of Education for comment
 and the commissioner for approval.  The district may not implement
 the program before obtaining the commissioner's approval of the
 proposed curriculum requirements.
 (g)  A student is entitled to a high school diploma if the
 student:
 (1)  successfully complies with the curriculum
 requirements specified under Subsection (e); and
 (2)  performs satisfactorily, as determined by the
 commissioner under Subsection (h), on end-of-course assessment
 instruments listed under Section 39.023(c) for courses in which the
 student was enrolled.
 (h)  For purposes of Subsection (g)(2), the commissioner
 shall determine the level of satisfactory performance on applicable
 end-of-course assessment instruments administered to a student.
 (i)  The school district shall report the academic
 achievement record of students who have completed the program on a
 transcript that clearly identifies the program and distinguishes
 the program from the other high school programs based on a
 traditional four-year period of attendance.
 (j)  A student who has received a diploma under the program
 is exempt from the compulsory school attendance requirements under
 Section 25.085.
 (k)  To the extent this section conflicts with any other
 provision of this code or rule adopted under this code, this section
 prevails.
 (l)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 42, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 42.2526 to read as follows:
 Sec. 42.2526.  ADJUSTMENT FOR DISTRICT OPERATING PILOT
 PROGRAM. (a)  This section applies only to a school district
 operating a pilot program authorized by Section 28.0255.
 (b)  Beginning with the first school year that follows the
 first school year in which students receive high school diplomas
 under the pilot program authorized by Section 28.0255 and
 continuing for every subsequent school year that the district
 operates the pilot program, the commissioner shall provide funding
 for the district's prekindergarten program under Section 29.153 on
 a full-day basis for a number of prekindergarten students equal to
 twice the number of students who received a high school diploma
 under the pilot program authorized by Section 28.0255 during the
 preceding school year.
 (c)  This section expires September 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *