House | 05/23/2013 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 4499 | |
House | 05/23/2013 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 4499 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | RV#1057 | Journal Page: 4169 |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 4169 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4169 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4154 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4154 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3090 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1454 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1454 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 962 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 385 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 285 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 285 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |