Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB771 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Uresti S.B. No. 771
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2013; February 26, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 18, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0;
 March 18, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 771 By:  Uresti


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to training for certain employees of the Department of
 Family and Protective Services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 40, Human Resources Code,
 is amended by adding Section 40.037 to read as follows:
 Sec. 40.037.  TRAINING PROGRAM FOR CHILD PROTECTIVE SERVICES
 MANAGERS. (a)  The department shall develop and implement a
 training program that each employee who is newly hired or promoted
 to a management position in the child protective services division
 must complete before the employee begins serving in the management
 position.
 (b)  The training program must be designed to assist the
 employee in developing skills, including communication,
 decision-making, and strategic thinking skills, to prepare the
 employee to assume management duties, including managing employee
 workloads, conducting effective unit meetings, managing a mobile
 workforce, implementing program and operational policies, and
 completing performance plans.
 (c)  The department may waive the training required by this
 section for an employee who has completed another training program
 provided by the department that is similar to the management
 training required by this section.
 SECTION 2.  Section 40.037, Human Resources Code, as added
 by this Act, applies only to a person who is newly hired or promoted
 to a management position in the child protective services division
 of the Department of Family and Protective Services on or after
 January 1, 2014.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2014.
 * * * * *