E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/20/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2069
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#913
|
Journal Page: 3559
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3559
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3559
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3429
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3429
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/10/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1494
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1187
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 656
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 487
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 355
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 355
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|