E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/16/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1908
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3519
|
Senate
|
05/16/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1896
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1908
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#821
|
Journal Page: 3217
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3217
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3217
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3217
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3104
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3104
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3103
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1913
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1201
|
House
|
04/02/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1201
|
House
|
03/26/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1103
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 660
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 616
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 621
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 487
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 356
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 356
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|