By: Schwertner S.B. No. 830 (In the Senate - Filed February 26, 2013; March 5, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human Services; April 15, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; April 15, 2013, sent to printer.) COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 830 By: Schwertner A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to use of telemedicine in certain trauma facilities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 773, Health and Safety Code, is amended by adding Section 773.1151 to read as follows: Sec. 773.1151. USE OF TELEMEDICINE BY CERTAIN TRAUMA FACILITIES. (a) In this section, "telemedicine" means a health care service that is initiated by a physician, advanced practice nurse, or physician assistant and that requires the use of advanced telecommunications technology, other than telephone or facsimile technology, including: (1) compressed digital interactive video, audio, or data transmission; (2) clinical data transmission using computer imaging by way of still-image capture and store and forward; and (3) other technology that facilitates access to health care services or medical specialty expertise. (b) A health care facility located in a county with a population of less than 50,000 may use telemedicine to satisfy a level IV trauma facility designation requirement relating to physicians if an on-call physician who has special competence in the care of critically injured patients uses telemedicine to provide patient assessment, diagnosis, consultation, or treatment or to transfer medical data to a physician, advanced practice nurse, or physician assistant located at the facility. (c) Department rules may not, as part of the requirements for designation of the facility as a level IV trauma facility, require the physical presence or physical availability of a physician who has special competence in the care of critically injured patients and may not prohibit the use of telemedicine that meets the requirements of Subsection (b). SECTION 2. The executive commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall adopt rules to implement Section 773.1151, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, not later than December 1, 2013. SECTION 3. Notwithstanding Section 773.1151, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, a health care facility located in a county with a population of less than 50,000 may use telemedicine to satisfy a level IV trauma facility designation requirement only on or after January 1, 2014. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2013. * * * * *