E | 05/18/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
E | 05/09/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1728 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3016 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1680 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1728 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 2841 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1625 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 1625 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 1624 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1623 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 1421 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#437 | Journal Page: 2204 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2204 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2204 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2177 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2177 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1744 | Journal Page: 2177 |
House | 04/19/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/19/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1698 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Technology | Journal Page: 1454 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1454 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1188 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 656 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 562 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Government Organization | Journal Page: 360 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 360 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |