Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB881 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Ellis S.B. No. 881
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2013; March 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Open Government;
 April 11, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 4, Nays 1; April 11, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 881 By:  Ellis


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to access to certain archaic information.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 552, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 552.0216 to read as follows:
 Sec. 552.0216.  RIGHT OF ACCESS TO CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION
 AFTER 75 YEARS. (a)  Information that is designated as
 confidential under law is public information and is available to
 the public:
 (1)  on or after the 75th anniversary of the date the
 information was originally created or received by the applicable
 governmental body; or
 (2)  after the expiration of a specified period for
 maintaining the confidentiality of the information in accordance
 with applicable law.
 (b)  This section does not apply to:
 (1)  information withheld under Section 442.007;
 (2)  information covered by Section 552.147; or
 (3)  information covered by Section 191.004, Natural
 Resources Code.
 (c)  This section does not limit the authority of a
 governmental body to establish retention periods for records under
 applicable law.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *