1 | 1 | | By: Uresti S.B. No. 889 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (Laubenberg) |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the physician assistant board. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subsection (a), Section 204.052, Occupations |
---|
10 | 10 | | Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | (a) The physician assistant board consists of 13 [nine] |
---|
12 | 12 | | members appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the |
---|
13 | 13 | | senate as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) seven [three] practicing physician assistant |
---|
15 | 15 | | members who each have at least five years of clinical experience as |
---|
16 | 16 | | a physician assistant; |
---|
17 | 17 | | (2) three physician members who are licensed in this |
---|
18 | 18 | | state and who supervise physician assistants; and |
---|
19 | 19 | | (3) three public members who are not licensed as a |
---|
20 | 20 | | physician or physician assistant. |
---|
21 | 21 | | SECTION 2. Subsection (a), Section 204.054, Occupations |
---|
22 | 22 | | Code, is amended to read as follows: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (a) Members of the physician assistant board are appointed |
---|
24 | 24 | | for staggered six-year terms. The terms of four or five [three] |
---|
25 | 25 | | members, as applicable, expire on February 1 of each odd-numbered |
---|
26 | 26 | | year. |
---|
27 | 27 | | SECTION 3. Section 204.055, Occupations Code, is amended to |
---|
28 | 28 | | read as follows: |
---|
29 | 29 | | Sec. 204.055. OFFICERS. The governor shall designate a |
---|
30 | 30 | | physician assistant member of the physician assistant board as the |
---|
31 | 31 | | presiding officer of the board to serve in that capacity at the will |
---|
32 | 32 | | of the governor. The physician assistant board shall select from |
---|
33 | 33 | | its membership a secretary to serve a one-year term. |
---|
34 | 34 | | SECTION 4. Not later than November 1, 2013, the governor |
---|
35 | 35 | | shall appoint four members to the physician assistant board as |
---|
36 | 36 | | provided by Subdivision (1), Subsection (a), Section 204.052, |
---|
37 | 37 | | Occupations Code, as amended by this Act, as follows: |
---|
38 | 38 | | (1) one member for a term expiring February 1, 2015; |
---|
39 | 39 | | (2) one member for a term expiring February 1, 2017; |
---|
40 | 40 | | and |
---|
41 | 41 | | (3) two members for terms expiring February 1, 2019. |
---|
42 | 42 | | SECTION 5. If, on the effective date of this Act, the |
---|
43 | 43 | | presiding officer of the physician assistant board does not meet |
---|
44 | 44 | | the qualifications for office as presiding officer under Section |
---|
45 | 45 | | 204.055, Occupations Code, as amended by this Act, the presiding |
---|
46 | 46 | | officer is removed from office as presiding officer on that date. |
---|
47 | 47 | | As soon as practicable on or after the effective date of this Act, |
---|
48 | 48 | | the governor shall appoint a presiding officer who meets the |
---|
49 | 49 | | qualifications under Section 204.055, Occupations Code, as amended |
---|
50 | 50 | | by this Act. |
---|
51 | 51 | | SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|