Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB889 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Uresti S.B. No. 889
 (Laubenberg)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the physician assistant board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (a), Section 204.052, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The physician assistant board consists of 13 [nine]
 members appointed by the governor with the advice and consent of the
 senate as follows:
 (1)  seven [three] practicing physician assistant
 members who each have at least five years of clinical experience as
 a physician assistant;
 (2)  three physician members who are licensed in this
 state and who supervise physician assistants; and
 (3)  three public members who are not licensed as a
 physician or physician assistant.
 SECTION 2.  Subsection (a), Section 204.054, Occupations
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Members of the physician assistant board are appointed
 for staggered six-year terms. The terms of four or five [three]
 members, as applicable, expire on February 1 of each odd-numbered
 year.
 SECTION 3.  Section 204.055, Occupations Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 204.055.  OFFICERS. The governor shall designate a
 physician assistant member of the physician assistant board as the
 presiding officer of the board to serve in that capacity at the will
 of the governor.  The physician assistant board shall select from
 its membership a secretary to serve a one-year term.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than November 1, 2013, the governor
 shall appoint four members to the physician assistant board as
 provided by Subdivision (1), Subsection (a), Section 204.052,
 Occupations Code, as amended by this Act, as follows:
 (1)  one member for a term expiring February 1, 2015;
 (2)  one member for a term expiring February 1, 2017;
 and
 (3)  two members for terms expiring February 1, 2019.
 SECTION 5.  If, on the effective date of this Act, the
 presiding officer of the physician assistant board does not meet
 the qualifications for office as presiding officer under Section
 204.055, Occupations Code, as amended by this Act, the presiding
 officer is removed from office as presiding officer on that date.
 As soon as practicable on or after the effective date of this Act,
 the governor shall appoint a presiding officer who meets the
 qualifications under Section 204.055, Occupations Code, as amended
 by this Act.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.