1 | 1 | | By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 898 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2013; March 5, 2013, |
---|
3 | 3 | | read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and |
---|
4 | 4 | | Military Installations; April 8, 2013, reported adversely, with |
---|
5 | 5 | | favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: |
---|
6 | 6 | | Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 8, 2013, sent to printer.) |
---|
7 | 7 | | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 898 By: Van de Putte |
---|
8 | 8 | | |
---|
9 | 9 | | |
---|
10 | 10 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
11 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
12 | 12 | | relating to the mental health program for veterans. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 1001.071, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
15 | 15 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | Sec. 1001.071. GENERAL POWERS AND DUTIES OF DEPARTMENT |
---|
17 | 17 | | RELATED TO HEALTH CARE. The department is responsible for |
---|
18 | 18 | | administering human services programs regarding the public health, |
---|
19 | 19 | | including: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (1) implementing the state's public health care |
---|
21 | 21 | | delivery programs under the authority of the department; |
---|
22 | 22 | | (2) administering state health facilities, hospitals, |
---|
23 | 23 | | and health care systems; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (3) developing and providing health care services, as |
---|
25 | 25 | | directed by law; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (4) providing for the prevention and control of |
---|
27 | 27 | | communicable diseases; |
---|
28 | 28 | | (5) providing public education on health-related |
---|
29 | 29 | | matters, as directed by law; |
---|
30 | 30 | | (6) compiling and reporting health-related |
---|
31 | 31 | | information, as directed by law; |
---|
32 | 32 | | (7) acting as the lead agency for implementation of |
---|
33 | 33 | | state policies regarding the human immunodeficiency virus and |
---|
34 | 34 | | acquired immunodeficiency syndrome and administering programs |
---|
35 | 35 | | related to the human immunodeficiency virus and acquired |
---|
36 | 36 | | immunodeficiency syndrome; |
---|
37 | 37 | | (8) investigating the causes of injuries and methods |
---|
38 | 38 | | of prevention; |
---|
39 | 39 | | (9) administering a grant program to provide |
---|
40 | 40 | | appropriated money to counties, municipalities, public health |
---|
41 | 41 | | districts, and other political subdivisions for their use to |
---|
42 | 42 | | provide or pay for essential public health services; |
---|
43 | 43 | | (10) administering the registration of vital |
---|
44 | 44 | | statistics; |
---|
45 | 45 | | (11) licensing, inspecting, and enforcing regulations |
---|
46 | 46 | | regarding health facilities, other than long-term care facilities |
---|
47 | 47 | | regulated by the Department of Aging and Disability Services; |
---|
48 | 48 | | (12) implementing established standards and |
---|
49 | 49 | | procedures for the management and control of sanitation and for |
---|
50 | 50 | | health protection measures; |
---|
51 | 51 | | (13) enforcing regulations regarding radioactive |
---|
52 | 52 | | materials; |
---|
53 | 53 | | (14) enforcing regulations regarding food, bottled |
---|
54 | 54 | | and vended drinking water, drugs, cosmetics, and health devices; |
---|
55 | 55 | | (15) enforcing regulations regarding food service |
---|
56 | 56 | | establishments, retail food stores, mobile food units, and roadside |
---|
57 | 57 | | food vendors; [and] |
---|
58 | 58 | | (16) enforcing regulations controlling hazardous |
---|
59 | 59 | | substances in households and workplaces; and |
---|
60 | 60 | | (17) implementing a mental health program for |
---|
61 | 61 | | veterans. |
---|
62 | 62 | | SECTION 2. Chapter 1001, Health and Safety Code, is amended |
---|
63 | 63 | | by adding Subchapter H to read as follows: |
---|
64 | 64 | | SUBCHAPTER H. MENTAL HEALTH PROGRAM FOR VETERANS |
---|
65 | 65 | | Sec. 1001.201. DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter: |
---|
66 | 66 | | (1) "Peer" means a person who is a veteran or a |
---|
67 | 67 | | veteran's family member. |
---|
68 | 68 | | (2) "Veteran" means a person who has served in: |
---|
69 | 69 | | (A) the army, navy, air force, coast guard, or |
---|
70 | 70 | | marine corps of the United States; |
---|
71 | 71 | | (B) the state military forces as defined by |
---|
72 | 72 | | Section 431.001, Government Code; or |
---|
73 | 73 | | (C) an auxiliary service of one of those branches |
---|
74 | 74 | | of the armed forces. |
---|
75 | 75 | | (3) "Volunteer coordinator" means a person who |
---|
76 | 76 | | recruits and retains veterans, peers, and volunteers to participate |
---|
77 | 77 | | in the mental health program for veterans and related activities. |
---|
78 | 78 | | Sec. 1001.202. GENERAL POWERS AND DUTIES. (a) The |
---|
79 | 79 | | department shall develop a mental health intervention program for |
---|
80 | 80 | | veterans. The program must include: |
---|
81 | 81 | | (1) peer-to-peer counseling; |
---|
82 | 82 | | (2) access to licensed mental health professionals for |
---|
83 | 83 | | volunteer coordinators and peers; |
---|
84 | 84 | | (3) training approved by the department for peers; |
---|
85 | 85 | | (4) technical assistance for volunteer coordinators |
---|
86 | 86 | | and peers; |
---|
87 | 87 | | (5) grants to regional and local organizations |
---|
88 | 88 | | providing services under this subchapter; |
---|
89 | 89 | | (6) recruitment, retention, and screening of |
---|
90 | 90 | | community-based therapists; |
---|
91 | 91 | | (7) suicide prevention training for volunteer |
---|
92 | 92 | | coordinators and peers; and |
---|
93 | 93 | | (8) veteran jail diversion services, including |
---|
94 | 94 | | veterans courts. |
---|
95 | 95 | | (b) The department shall solicit and ensure that |
---|
96 | 96 | | specialized training is provided to persons who are peers and who |
---|
97 | 97 | | want to provide peer-to-peer counseling or other peer-to-peer |
---|
98 | 98 | | services under the program. |
---|
99 | 99 | | (c) The department may adopt rules necessary to implement |
---|
100 | 100 | | this subchapter. |
---|
101 | 101 | | Sec. 1001.203. GRANTS. (a) The department shall establish |
---|
102 | 102 | | a grant program through which the department may award grants to |
---|
103 | 103 | | regional and local organizations for the delivery of programs or |
---|
104 | 104 | | services described by this subchapter. |
---|
105 | 105 | | (b) A grant awarded under this section must: |
---|
106 | 106 | | (1) emphasize direct services to veterans provided by |
---|
107 | 107 | | peers; |
---|
108 | 108 | | (2) leverage additional local resources to provide |
---|
109 | 109 | | funding for programs or services for veterans; and |
---|
110 | 110 | | (3) increase the capacity of the mental health program |
---|
111 | 111 | | for veterans. |
---|
112 | 112 | | (c) A grant awarded under this section may not be used to |
---|
113 | 113 | | supplant existing expenditures associated with programs or |
---|
114 | 114 | | services within the department. |
---|
115 | 115 | | Sec. 1001.204. ANNUAL REPORT. Not later than December 1 of |
---|
116 | 116 | | each year, the department shall submit a report to the governor and |
---|
117 | 117 | | the legislature that includes: |
---|
118 | 118 | | (1) the number of veterans who received services |
---|
119 | 119 | | through the mental health program for veterans; |
---|
120 | 120 | | (2) the number of peers and volunteer coordinators |
---|
121 | 121 | | trained; |
---|
122 | 122 | | (3) a summary of the grants awarded and services |
---|
123 | 123 | | provided through those grants; |
---|
124 | 124 | | (4) an evaluation of the services provided under this |
---|
125 | 125 | | subchapter; and |
---|
126 | 126 | | (5) recommendations for program improvements. |
---|
127 | 127 | | SECTION 3. Section 1001.076, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
128 | 128 | | repealed. |
---|
129 | 129 | | SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2014, the Department of |
---|
130 | 130 | | State Health Services shall modify the mental health intervention |
---|
131 | 131 | | program for veterans as required by Subchapter H, Chapter 1001, |
---|
132 | 132 | | Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
133 | 133 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2013. |
---|
134 | 134 | | * * * * * |
---|