Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB898 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 898
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2013; March 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran Affairs and
 Military Installations; April 8, 2013, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:
 Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 8, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 898 By:  Van de Putte


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the mental health program for veterans.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1001.071, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1001.071.  GENERAL POWERS AND DUTIES OF DEPARTMENT
 RELATED TO HEALTH CARE. The department is responsible for
 administering human services programs regarding the public health,
 including:
 (1)  implementing the state's public health care
 delivery programs under the authority of the department;
 (2)  administering state health facilities, hospitals,
 and health care systems;
 (3)  developing and providing health care services, as
 directed by law;
 (4)  providing for the prevention and control of
 communicable diseases;
 (5)  providing public education on health-related
 matters, as directed by law;
 (6)  compiling and reporting health-related
 information, as directed by law;
 (7)  acting as the lead agency for implementation of
 state policies regarding the human immunodeficiency virus and
 acquired immunodeficiency syndrome and administering programs
 related to the human immunodeficiency virus and acquired
 immunodeficiency syndrome;
 (8)  investigating the causes of injuries and methods
 of prevention;
 (9)  administering a grant program to provide
 appropriated money to counties, municipalities, public health
 districts, and other political subdivisions for their use to
 provide or pay for essential public health services;
 (10)  administering the registration of vital
 statistics;
 (11)  licensing, inspecting, and enforcing regulations
 regarding health facilities, other than long-term care facilities
 regulated by the Department of Aging and Disability Services;
 (12)  implementing established standards and
 procedures for the management and control of sanitation and for
 health protection measures;
 (13)  enforcing regulations regarding radioactive
 materials;
 (14)  enforcing regulations regarding food, bottled
 and vended drinking water, drugs, cosmetics, and health devices;
 (15)  enforcing regulations regarding food service
 establishments, retail food stores, mobile food units, and roadside
 food vendors; [and]
 (16)  enforcing regulations controlling hazardous
 substances in households and workplaces; and
 (17)  implementing a mental health program for
 veterans.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 1001, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter H to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER H.  MENTAL HEALTH PROGRAM FOR VETERANS
 Sec. 1001.201.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Peer" means a person who is a veteran or a
 veteran's family member.
 (2)  "Veteran" means a person who has served in:
 (A)  the army, navy, air force, coast guard, or
 marine corps of the United States;
 (B)  the state military forces as defined by
 Section 431.001, Government Code; or
 (C)  an auxiliary service of one of those branches
 of the armed forces.
 (3)  "Volunteer coordinator" means a person who
 recruits and retains veterans, peers, and volunteers to participate
 in the mental health program for veterans and related activities.
 Sec. 1001.202.  GENERAL POWERS AND DUTIES. (a)  The
 department shall develop a mental health intervention program for
 veterans.  The program must include:
 (1)  peer-to-peer counseling;
 (2)  access to licensed mental health professionals for
 volunteer coordinators and peers;
 (3)  training approved by the department for peers;
 (4)  technical assistance for volunteer coordinators
 and peers;
 (5)  grants to regional and local organizations
 providing services under this subchapter;
 (6)  recruitment, retention, and screening of
 community-based therapists;
 (7)  suicide prevention training for volunteer
 coordinators and peers; and
 (8)  veteran jail diversion services, including
 veterans courts.
 (b)  The department shall solicit and ensure that
 specialized training is provided to persons who are peers and who
 want to provide peer-to-peer counseling or other peer-to-peer
 services under the program.
 (c)  The department may adopt rules necessary to implement
 this subchapter.
 Sec. 1001.203.  GRANTS. (a)  The department shall establish
 a grant program through which the department may award grants to
 regional and local organizations for the delivery of programs or
 services described by this subchapter.
 (b)  A grant awarded under this section must:
 (1)  emphasize direct services to veterans provided by
 peers;
 (2)  leverage additional local resources to provide
 funding for programs or services for veterans; and
 (3)  increase the capacity of the mental health program
 for veterans.
 (c)  A grant awarded under this section may not be used to
 supplant existing expenditures associated with programs or
 services within the department.
 Sec. 1001.204.  ANNUAL REPORT.  Not later than December 1 of
 each year, the department shall submit a report to the governor and
 the legislature that includes:
 (1)  the number of veterans who received services
 through the mental health program for veterans;
 (2)  the number of peers and volunteer coordinators
 trained;
 (3)  a summary of the grants awarded and services
 provided through those grants;
 (4)  an evaluation of the services provided under this
 subchapter; and
 (5)  recommendations for program improvements.
 SECTION 3.  Section 1001.076, Health and Safety Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than January 1, 2014, the Department of
 State Health Services shall modify the mental health intervention
 program for veterans as required by Subchapter H, Chapter 1001,
 Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *