House | 05/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3909 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 3089 | |
House | 05/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3089 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2721 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1674 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1553 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1553 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1553 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1552 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1552 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1552 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1552 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 415 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 415 | |
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |